VA HB1785 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (5-Y 17-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (5-Y 17-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Food establishment inspections; exemptions. Exempts from inspections by the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services private homes where the resident processes and prepares any yogurt that has an equilibrium pH value of 4.6 or lower or baked good, subject to certain conditions. Current law exempts only those baked goods that do not require time or temperature control after preparation. The bill removes the requirement that private homes where the resident processes pickles or other acidified vegetables sell less than $3,000 in gross sales in a calendar year in order to qualify for such exemption. This bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Food establishment inspections; exemptions for private homes where resident processes yogurt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (5-Y 17-N) (Y: 5 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (5-Y 17-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101582D |