VA HB1785 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; collection of fines, costs, penalties, forfeitures, and restitution. Authorizes a local treasurer to recover the costs of collecting fines, costs, penalties, forfeitures, and restitution pursuant to an agreement with the attorney for the Commonwealth in an amount not to exceed 20 percent of the amounts collected, and authorizes the local treasurer when undertaking such collection to employ collection powers used when collecting local taxes.
Title
Local treasurer; authorized to be compensated when collecting fines, costs, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1785H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104758D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104758D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103401D |