VA HB1783 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile records; confidentiality. Clarifies that the Department of Juvenile Justice may share confidential juvenile records with persons, agencies, and institutions having a legitimate interest regardless of the state in which they are located. The bill also allows the Department to share confidential juvenile records with a requesting party who has custody or is providing supervision for a juvenile and the release of the confidential information is in the interest of maintaining security in a secure facility in a state other than Virginia provided it meets that state's definition of "secure facility."
Title
Juvenile Justice, Department of; confidentiality of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 99 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1783ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reconsidered by Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101124D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1166 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)