VA HB1782 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Corrections; membership; powers and duties; review of deaths of inmates in local correctional facilities. Authorizes the State Board of Corrections (Board) to conduct a review of the death of any inmate in a local or regional correctional facility in order to determine the circumstances surrounding the inmate's death and whether the facility was in compliance with the Board's regulations. The bill requires the Board to develop and implement policies and procedures for the review of the death of any inmate that occurs in any local or regional correctional facility. The bill also requires that the State Department of Health and the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner assist the Board in developing and implementing these policies and procedures and with any death review undertaken by the Board. The bill provides that any death review shall be performed by Department of Corrections (Department) staff designated by the Board and requires the Board to submit a report of the findings of a completed investigation to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Department. The bill also specifies requisite qualifications for individuals appointed to the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections, State Board of; membership, powers and duties, review of deaths of inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseLeft in Appropriations
2017-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-31HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2017-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-30HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Mental Health
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-20HouseReferred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
2017-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103517D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32119(n/a)See Bill Text
321279(n/a)See Bill Text
531127(n/a)See Bill Text
5312(n/a)See Bill Text
5315(n/a)See Bill Text
53169.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback