VA HB1779 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Riparian planting ground assignment eligibility. Authorizes the Commissioner of the Marine Resources Commission to assign to a land owner who is eligible to apply for riparian planting grounds only a planting ground that the Commissioner, in his discretion, deems appropriate to encompass as much as one-half acre of ground. The bill authorizes the Commissioner to consider assigning an area that the owner designates within his riparian waters and provides that the assignment shall not extend farther than the nearest edge of the channel or the middle of the body of water, whichever is the shorter distance. The bill removes a provision stating that the fee for such assignment shall be $1.50.
Title
Riparian planting ground; assignment eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 152 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1779ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1779H1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105174D-H1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105174D-H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102022D |