VA HB1779 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hate crimes; immigration status; penalty. Adds immigration status to the categories of victims whose intentional selection for a hate crime involving assault, assault and battery, or trespass for the purpose of damaging another's property results in a higher criminal penalty for the offense. The bill also adds immigration status to the categories of hate crimes that are to be reported to the central repository of information regarding hate crimes maintained by the Virginia State Police.
Title
Hate crimes; immigration status; penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Daun Hester [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102507D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1779 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1779+hil |