VA HB1778 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1778
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Removal of clutter from property; civil penalty. Provides that a locality may by ordinance require the removal of clutter from property, except on land zoned for or in active farming operation, or may, whenever the governing body deems it necessary, after reasonable notice, have such clutter removed by its own agents or employees, in which event the cost or expenses thereof shall be chargeable to and paid by the owners of such property and may be collected by the locality as taxes are collected. The bill defines "clutter" as including mechanical equipment, household furniture, containers, and similar items that may be detrimental to the well-being of a community when they are left in public view for an extended period or are allowed to accumulate. Violations of the bill are subject to the existing civil penalty applicable to violations of provisions relating to the removal of trash, garbage, refuse, litter, and similar substances from property. Removal of clutter from property; civil penalty. Provides that a locality may by ordinance require the removal of clutter from property, except on land zoned for or in active farming operation, or may, whenever the governing body deems it necessary, after reasonable notice, have such clutter removed by its own agents or employees, in which event the cost or expenses thereof shall be chargeable to and paid by the owners of such property and may be collected by the locality as taxes are collected. The bill defines "clutter" as including mechanical equipment, household furniture, containers, and similar items that may be detrimental to the well-being of a community when they are left in public view for an extended period or are allowed to accumulate. Violations of the bill are subject to the existing civil penalty applicable to violations of provisions relating to the removal of trash, garbage, refuse, litter, and similar substances from property.
Title
Removal of clutter from property; definition, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1778ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (52-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101674D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1778 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)