VA HB1776 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Business park electric infrastructure program. Makes permanent and amends certain provisions of the Code related to the business park electric infrastructure program conducted by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership. The bill requires that the program be conducted in the service territory or transmission zone of each Phase I and Phase II Utility and permits costs incurred by the utility in installing the business park electric infrastructure to be recovered pursuant to a rate adjustment clause approved by the State Corporation Commission. The bill also requires a utility to obtain a certificate from the Commission prior to constructing business park electric infrastructure and requires the Commission to institute a rulemaking proceeding by September 1, 2023, to establish requirements for the program.
Title
Business park electric infrastructure program; makes permanent and amends certain provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 704 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1776ER) |
2023-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1776H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104667D-H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104667D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101846D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1420 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)