VA HB1775 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Persons with developmental disabilities; terminology. Corrects numerous sections of the Code of Virginia by replacing the term "intellectual disability" with "developmental disabilities" as appropriate.
Title
Persons with developmental disabilities; terminology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1775ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101368D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |