VA HB1772 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council; advisory opinions; evidence in civil proceeding. Provides that any officer, employee, or member of a public body alleged to have willfully and knowingly violated the Virginia Freedom of Information Act who acted in good faith reliance upon an advisory opinion issued by the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council may introduce such advisory opinion as evidence that the alleged violation was not made willfully and knowingly. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council; advisory opinions, evidence in civil proceeding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 354 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1772ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100432D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223715(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1772
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1772+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1772ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0354+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0004+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0048+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0044+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0053+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2059+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S10V0071+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0832HB1772+HB1772
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB1772+HB1772

Bill Comments

feedback