VA HB1770 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday store hours; distiller commission. Requires the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority) to pay a distiller who operates a government store on the distiller's licensed premises a commission of not less than 20 percent of the retail price of any goods sold. The bill also allows certain government stores, as determined by the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Authority, to be open on Sundays for the sale of alcoholic beverages after 10:00 a.m. Finally, the bill grants the Board the power to employ or retain in-house legal counsel to advise or represent the Authority in hearings, controversies, or other matters involving the interests of the Authority. The bill provides, however, that upon request by the Board, the Attorney General shall provide legal services for the Authority in accordance with current law. This bill is identical to SB 1668.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; Sunday store hours, distiller commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 15-N) (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 91-N) (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 13-N) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1770ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 15-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (74-Y 15-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference substitute printed 19107301D-H1
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2019-02-13SenateSenators: Reeves, Mason, Norment
2019-02-13SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-13HouseDelegates: Knight, Peace, Aird
2019-02-13HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-13HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-13SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-13SenateSenate insisted on amendments (37-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 91-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 91-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-12SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-12SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 2-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 13-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 13-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102169D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1770E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (17-Y 4-N)
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102169D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41119(n/a)See Bill Text
41120(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1770
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1770+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1770E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1770H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1770ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0009+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0043+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0011+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0076+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0083+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2454+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0067+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1770+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0527HB1770+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2801+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0596HB1770+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1035HB1770+HB1770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3290+HB1770

Bill Comments

feedback