VA HB177 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB177

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Presidential electors; National Popular Vote Compact. Enters Virginia into an interstate compact known as the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote. Article II of the Constitution of the United States gives the states exclusive and plenary authority to decide the manner of awarding their electoral votes. Under the compact, Virginia agrees to award its electoral votes to the presidential ticket that receives the most popular votes in all 50 states and the District of Columbia. The compact goes into effect when states cumulatively possessing a majority of the electoral votes have joined the compact. A state may withdraw from the compact; however, a withdrawal occurring within six months of the end of a President's term shall not become effective until a President or Vice President has qualified to serve the next term.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Presidential electors; National Popular Vote Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB177H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107262D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB199 (Price)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107262D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-07HouseReconsidered by Privileges and Elections
2020-01-31HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 12-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
2019-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100671D

Same As/Similar To

HB199 (Similar To)
HB177 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242209.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242209.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback