VA HB1768 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child-protective services; investigations; interview by child advocacy center. Requires that if a local multidisciplinary team has determined during an investigation of a report of child abuse or neglect that an interview of the child by a child advocacy center recognized by the National Children's Alliance is needed and an interview with a recognized child advocacy center within the jurisdiction cannot be completed within 14 days, the local department of social services may facilitate the interview with a recognized child advocacy center located in another jurisdiction. Child-protective services; investigations; interview by child advocacy center. Requires that if a local multidisciplinary team has determined during an investigation of a report of child abuse or neglect that an interview of the child by a child advocacy center recognized by the National Children's Alliance is needed and an interview with a recognized child advocacy center within the jurisdiction cannot be completed within 14 days, the local department of social services may facilitate the interview with a recognized child advocacy center located in another jurisdiction.
Title
Child protective services; investigations, interview by child advocacy center, time limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1768ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1768H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 23106095D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions amendment rejected |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106095D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103807D |