VA HB1764 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1764
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Crewe; town council; elections and powers. Makes various changes to the charter for the Town of Crewe in Nottoway County, including (i) staggering town council elections; (ii) changing from three to two the number of town council members required to call a special meeting; and (iii) transferring from the town council to the town manager the authority to appoint, suspend, or terminate the chief of police with majority approval by the town council. The bill also repeals provisions related to the establishment of a municipal court.
Title
Crewe, Town of; amending charter, changes to charter including town council, elections and powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101611D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1764 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)