VA HB1762 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Worker cooperatives. Establishes worker cooperatives as a category of cooperative associations. A worker cooperative is a stock corporation that has elected to be governed by provisions established by this measure, which include (i) conducting its business primarily for the mutual benefit of its members, (ii) allowing only current and retired employees to be members, (iii) limiting voting rights to current employees, (iv) providing that each employee is entitled to one vote, and (v) requiring that net earnings be paid or credited to members in accordance with the ratio that each member's amount of work performed during a period bears to the total amount of work performed by all members during that period.
Title
Worker cooperatives; established as a category of cooperative associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100246D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 355 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |