VA HB1762 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Inclusion of substance in controlled substances Schedule I. Adds 5-methoxy-N,N-dimethyltryptamine (5-MeO-DMT), a hallucinogenic substance found in psychoactive toads and plants, to the list of controlled substances in Schedule I.
Title
Schedule I; adds 5-methoxy-N,N-dimethyltryptamine to list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2011-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103521D |