VA HB1761 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

State Corporation Commission; Energy-Intensive Trade-Exposed Industries work group; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission to convene a work group for the purposes of assessing the competitiveness of manufacturers in energy-intensive trade-exposed industries in the Commonwealth to foreign manufacturers that are not required to meet the same federal and state standards regarding labor, energy, intellectual property, and environmental factors. The bill defines "energy-intensive trade-exposed industry" and establishes the requirements for the membership of the work group. The work group is required to report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Commerce and Energy and the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor no later than December 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy-intensive trade-exposed industries; SCC to convene workgroup to assess competitiveness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Commerce and Energy
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
2023-01-25HouseAssigned sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102053D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback