VA HB1760 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps; established. Establishes the Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps for the purposes of attaining and retaining public elementary and secondary school teachers in school divisions in the Commonwealth by awarding scholarships to students seeking to obtain teaching degrees and certifications at participating institutions and requiring such students upon completion of their degree or certificate to fill teaching positions for one year for each year of scholarship receipt at a high-need school, as defined pursuant to federal law. The bill also creates the Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps Scholarship Fund and Program for the purpose of funding such scholarships at the participating institutions of Longwood University, Norfolk State University, Radford University, and Virginia Commonwealth University. Finally, the bill establishes the 12-member Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps Commission to administer the Program and directs the Commission to begin meeting on or after September 1, 2023, and to establish the parameters for the Program and award the first scholarships prior to the beginning of the 2024–2025 academic year. Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps; established. Establishes the Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps for the purposes of attaining and retaining public elementary and secondary school teachers in school divisions in the Commonwealth by awarding scholarships to students seeking to obtain teaching degrees and certifications at participating institutions and requiring such students upon completion of their degree or certificate to fill teaching positions for one year for each year of scholarship receipt at a high-need school, as defined pursuant to federal law. The bill also creates the Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps Scholarship Fund and Program for the purpose of funding such scholarships at the participating institutions of Longwood University, Norfolk State University, Radford University, and Virginia Commonwealth University. Finally, the bill establishes the 12-member Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps Commission to administer the Program and directs the Commission to begin meeting on or after September 1, 2023, and to establish the parameters for the Program and award the first scholarships prior to the beginning of the 2024–2025 academic year.
Title
Virginia Teacher Residency Training Corps; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105276D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100268D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 647 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |