VA HB1760 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1760
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation easements; construction. Provides that an easement held pursuant to the Virginia Conservation Easement Act or the Open-Space Land Act shall be construed in favor of achieving the conservation purposes for which it was created. Conservation easements; construction. Provides that an easement held pursuant to the Virginia Conservation Easement Act or the Open-Space Land Act shall be construed in favor of achieving the conservation purposes for which it was created.
Title
Conservation easements; certain easements be liberally construed in favor of purpose which created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1760H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21102392D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 21102392D-H1 |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101159D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1760 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1016.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1026.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1705.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |