VA HB1758 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption by stepparent; background check. Removes, effective July 1, 2019, the ability of a prospective adoptive parent, who is a spouse of a birth parent or parent by adoption and who has filed a petition for adoption, to request the Department of State Police to conduct a national criminal background check of such prospective adoptive parent. Under current law, this provision is set to expire July 1, 2020. The bill also removes the condition that a prospective adoptive parent provide the court with a national background check of such person, but continues to require a court to consider such report.
Title
Adoption by stepparent; background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102197D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1242 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |