VA HB1758 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Adoption by stepparent; background check. Removes, effective July 1, 2019, the ability of a prospective adoptive parent, who is a spouse of a birth parent or parent by adoption and who has filed a petition for adoption, to request the Department of State Police to conduct a national criminal background check of such prospective adoptive parent. Under current law, this provision is set to expire July 1, 2020. The bill also removes the condition that a prospective adoptive parent provide the court with a national background check of such person, but continues to require a court to consider such report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption by stepparent; background checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102197D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.02(n/a)See Bill Text
6321242(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback