VA HB1757 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum wage; tipped employees; classification. Prohibits an employee who is prohibited by applicable federal or state law or regulation from soliciting tips from being classified as a tipped employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage; tipped employees, classification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-21HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102395D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback