VA HB1757 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School personnel; staffing ratios; school nurses. Requires each local school board to employ at least one full-time equivalent school nurse position in each elementary school, middle school, and high school in the local school division and at least one full-time equivalent school nurse position per 1,000 students in grades kindergarten through 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School personnel; staffing ratios; school nurses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseLeft in Appropriations
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-25HouseReported from Education with amendments (19-Y 2-N)
2017-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
2017-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100964D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text
221274(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback