VA HB1757 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund. Abolishes the Capital Access Fund for Disadvantaged Businesses, which provides loan guarantees, loan loss reserves, and interest rate write downs for disadvantaged businesses, and replaces it with the Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund. The new fund will provide direct loans to eligible small, women-owned, and minority-owned businesses. The bill requires the Small Business Financing Authority and the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to transfer cash balances in the Capital Access Fund for Disadvantaged Businesses to the Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small, Women-owned, and Minority-owned Business Loan Fund; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 9-N) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
2015-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1757ER)
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled
2015-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N)
2015-02-23HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (83-Y 10-N)
2015-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2015-02-19SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2015-02-19SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-16SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2015-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-09HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 9-N)
2015-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House (84-Y 9-N)
2015-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 15102190D-E
2015-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1757E
2015-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2015-02-06HouseRead second time
2015-02-05HouseRead first time
2015-02-03HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (18-Y 2-N)
2015-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2015-01-20HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2015-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2015-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102190D

Same As/Similar To

SB854 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182213.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221605(n/a)See Bill Text
222311(n/a)See Bill Text
222311.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1757
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1757+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1757E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1757ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0696+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H1102V0014+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H11V0057+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H11V0095+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV1982+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S12V0109+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0559HB1757+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0615HB1757+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2625+HB1757

Bill Comments 750

feedback