VA HB1757 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Address Confidentiality Program. Expands the Address Confidentiality Program for victims of domestic violence to all jurisdictions within the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that the Office of the Attorney General will prepare an evaluation of the statewide implementation of the program by December 31, 2012, and repeals the enactment clause that conditioned the continuation of the program upon an appropriation for that purpose. The bill is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of domestic violence; expands Address Confidentiality Program to all jurisdictions in State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-15 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
2011-03-15 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-28 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-26 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-25 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1757ER)
2011-02-25 House: Enrolled
2011-02-21 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-21 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-18 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-16 Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2011-02-09 Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2011-02-09 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-08 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-08 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 House: Read second time and engrossed
2011-02-04 House: Read first time
2011-02-02 House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 House: Assigned App. sub: General Government
2011-01-28 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2011-01-28 House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2011-01-28 House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2011-01-28 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2011-01-24 House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101253D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22515.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1757
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1757+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1757ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0097+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H1503V0013+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H15V0019+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H0205V0001+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H02V0038+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV0569+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S12V0165+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0549HB1757+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0564HB1757+HB1757

Bill Comments 750

feedback