VA HB1756 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Attorney-issued subpoenas; release of witness. Provides that, in a civil case only, a person to whom an attorney-issued subpoena is directed may be released from compliance with such subpoena by the attorney who issued the subpoena or a person acting on such attorney's behalf. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference. Attorney-issued subpoenas; release of witness. Provides that, in a civil case only, a person to whom an attorney-issued subpoena is directed may be released from compliance with such subpoena by the attorney who issued the subpoena or a person acting on such attorney's behalf. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney-issued subpoenas; release of witness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
2023-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1756ER)
2023-02-22HouseEnrolled
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2023-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendments (30-Y 10-N)
2023-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2023-02-15SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-02-15SenateReading of amendments waived
2023-02-15SenateRead third time
2023-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
2023-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-25HouseRead first time
2023-01-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
2023-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100034D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161265(n/a)See Bill Text
801407(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1756
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1756+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1756ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0092+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106606A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1756AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1756ASE
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0802V0005+HB1756
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0040+HB1756
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1129+HB1756
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0228+HB1756
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0456HB1756+HB1756
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0482HB1756+HB1756
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1998+HB1756

Bill Comments

feedback