VA HB1756 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Campaign finance; prohibited contributions to candidates. Prohibits any candidate from soliciting or accepting a contribution from any public service corporation, as defined in the bill, or any political action committee established and administered by such a corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance; prohibited contributions to candidates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-12-16HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100747D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242947.4:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback