VA HB1756 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Education improvement scholarships tax credit; eligibility requirements. Eliminates the requirement that a student currently or recently have attended public school in order to qualify for a scholarship from a scholarship foundation that provides tax-credit-derived scholarships. The bill increases the maximum annual scholarship amount from 100 percent of the per pupil amount distributed to the local school division as its share of standards of quality costs (i) for a student with a disability, to 400 percent of such amount and (ii) for a student who has an autism spectrum disorder, to $26,000. The bill adds to the definition of "qualified educational expenses" expenditures made in connection to summer education.
Title
Education improvement scholarships tax credit; eligibility requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102985D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1756 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1756+hil |