VA HB1755 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Step therapy protocols; disclosures. Requires health insurers that limit coverage for prescription drugs through the use of a step therapy protocol to have in place a process for a prescribing provider to request an override of the protocol for a patient. A step therapy protocol is a protocol or program that establishes the specific sequence in which prescription drugs for a specified medical condition are medically appropriate for a particular patient and are covered by a health benefit plan or that conditions coverage of a prescription medication on a patient first trying an alternative medication without success. The measure requires the granting of a step therapy protocol override in certain circumstances. Finally, the measure requires an insurer that offers a health benefit plan that uses a step therapy protocol to provide (i) written notice of a determination that the protocol requires denial of coverage of a provider's selected prescription drug, (ii) an explanation of the basis for such determination, and (iii) notice of the procedures for submitting a request for an override of the restrictions of the step therapy protocol.
Title
Step therapy protocols; disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101997D |