VA HB1753 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibit certain local government practices that would require contractors to provide certain compensation or benefits. Prohibits local governing bodies from establishing provisions related to procurement of goods, professional services, or construction that would require a wage floor or any other employee benefit or compensation above what is otherwise required by state or federal law to be provided by a contractor to one or more of the contractor's employees as part of a contract with the locality. The prohibition shall not affect contracts between a locality and another party that were executed prior to January 1, 2018, or the renewal or future rebids of services thereof. The bill provides that localities shall not be prohibited from entering into contracts for economic development incentives in which the company receiving the incentives is required to maintain a certain stated wage level for its employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; prohibiting certain practice requiring contractors to provide compensation, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05House(67 affirmative votes required to override)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (66-Y 34-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-16 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1753ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-22SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-22SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22SenateChair votes No
2017-02-22SenateDefeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2017-02-22SenateRead third time
2017-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 33-N)
2017-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (64-Y 33-N)
2017-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-26HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseReported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N)
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102959D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1753
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1753+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1753ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1102V0016+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0036+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1716+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0184+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0802HB1753+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0859HB1753+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0860HB1753+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0861HB1753+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2858+HB1753

Bill Comments

feedback