VA HB1751 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1751
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Excise tax on peanuts. Extends from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2026, the sunset date of the excise tax on all peanuts grown in Virginia and reduces from $0.30 per 100 pounds to $0.25 per 100 pounds the excise tax rate. The proceeds from this tax are used for promoting the sales and use of Virginia peanuts.
Title
Peanuts; extends sunset date of excise tax on all peanuts grown in Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100674D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1751 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)