VA HB1750 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish and administer the Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program (the Program). The bill provides that any dairy farmer that has a resource management plan or nutrient management plan and participates in the federal margin coverage program for dairy producers at the tier I level as contained in the federal Agriculture Improvement Act of 2018 is eligible to participate in the Program. Under the bill, each year a Program participant will receive a refund of its annual premium payment paid into the federal program. Such reimbursement shall be provided on a first-come, first-served basis and shall be subject to availability of funds expressly appropriated for the purposes set forth in the chapter. The Commissioner shall submit an annual report no later than December 1 of each year to the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources assessing the effectiveness of the Program. Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish and administer the Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program (the Program). The bill provides that any dairy farmer that has a resource management plan or nutrient management plan and participates in the federal margin coverage program for dairy producers at the tier I level as contained in the federal Agriculture Improvement Act of 2018 is eligible to participate in the Program. Under the bill, each year a Program participant will receive a refund of its annual premium payment paid into the federal program. Such reimbursement shall be provided on a first-come, first-served basis and shall be subject to availability of funds expressly appropriated for the purposes set forth in the chapter. The Commissioner shall submit an annual report no later than December 1 of each year to the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources assessing the effectiveness of the Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1750H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103881D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103881D-H1
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-12-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102311D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323304(n/a)See Bill Text
323305(n/a)See Bill Text
323306(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1750
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1750+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1750H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103881D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103881.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1750F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1750FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0101V0005+HB1750
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H01V0040+HB1750
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0201V0005+HB1750
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0067+HB1750
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1346+HB1750
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1408+HB1750
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01V0054+HB1750

Bill Comments

feedback