VA HB1747 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; retaliatory discharge of employee. Prohibits an employer or other person from discharging an employee if the discharge is motivated to any extent by knowledge or belief that the employee has filed a claim or taken or intends to take certain other actions under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act. Currently, retaliatory discharges are prohibited only if the employer or other person discharged an employee solely because the employee has taken or intends to take such an action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; retaliatory discharge of employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 6-N) (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 6-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-20HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100222D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback