VA HB1747 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Qualified advance directive facilitators. Defines "qualified advance directive facilitator" as a person who has successfully completed a training program approved by the Department of Health for providing assistance in completing and executing a written advance directive; establishes requirements for training programs for qualified advance directive facilitators; and provides that distribution of a form for an advance directive that meets the requirements of ยง 54.1-2984 and the provision of ministerial assistance to a person with regard to the completion or execution of such form shall not constitute the unauthorized practice of law. This bill is identical to SB 1242.
Title
Advance directives; persons authorized to provide assistance in completing, training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1747ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, Barker, Black |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Delegates: O'Bannon, Stolle, Aird |
2017-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-20 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 96-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1747H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104443D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104443D-H1 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101056D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2982 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2988 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2988.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |