VA HB1747 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of child pornography by law enforcement. Provides that an employee of a law-enforcement agency may lawfully possess child pornography for a bona fide law-enforcement purpose.
Title
Child pornography; possession by law-enforcement agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399) | |
2011-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1747ER) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101104D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)