VA HB1746 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Conduct of elections; vote counting; required live video recording. Requires the general registrar of each county and city to provide for a live video recording of each polling place while absentee ballots are cast, votes are counted, and returns are completed, and of each central absentee precinct while ballots are handled and returns are completed. The general registrars are required to ensure the video coverage is recorded and retained until the deadline to request a recount has passed and, if any contest or recount is pending thereafter, until it has been concluded. The bill provides that each live video recording must include date and time indicators and be linked to the official website of the county or city. The Department of Elections is required to post links on its official website to the video coverage for viewing by the public. The bill provides that any disruption in video coverage shall not affect or prevent the continued casting of absentee ballots, counting of votes, or completion of returns, and is not grounds for an election contest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conduct of elections; vote counting, required live video recording.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2020-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100832D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242655.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback