VA HB1746 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Operation of bicycles on certain bicycle paths and trails, bicycle lanes, and shared-use paths. Provides that wherever a bicycle path or trail designated by the Department of Conservation and Recreation, a bicycle lane, or a shared-use path is available to bicyclists as an alternative to a roadway available for motor vehicles, bicyclists are required use those paths, lanes, and trails and are prohibited from using roadways available for operation of motor vehicles.
Title
Bicycles; operation on certain bicycle paths and trails, bicycle lanes, and shared-use paths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100041D |