VA HB1745 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Defeated by Senate (17-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators; prohibited acts. Prohibits tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators from monitoring law-enforcement communications in order to determine the location of a wrecked or disabled vehicle that is subject to a law-enforcement-requested tow for the purpose of driving by the scene of such vehicle to initiate contact with the owner or operator of the vehicle to solicit or offer towing services and prohibits tow truck drivers from driving by the scene of a wrecked or disabled vehicle for the same purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators; prohibited acts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 21-N) (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-21SenateDefeated by Senate (17-Y 21-N)
2023-02-21SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 18-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Transportation (11-Y 3-N)
2023-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N)
2023-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
2023-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-23HouseRead first time
2023-01-19HouseReported from Transportation (19-Y 1-N)
2023-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-13HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding
2023-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101420D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462118(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1745
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1745+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1745F122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1902V0005+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0027+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0039+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1082+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S11V0088+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB1745+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0693HB1745+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0695HB1745+HB1745
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0696HB1745+HB1745

Bill Comments

feedback