VA HB1744 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Smoking in motor vehicle with a minor present. Expands the age group of minors in the presence of whom it is illegal to smoke in a motor vehicle from those under the age of eight to those under the age of 18. The bill changes smoking in a motor vehicle with a minor present from a secondary offense to a primary offense.
Title
Smoking; unlawful in motor vehicle with a minor present.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] |
Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102381D |