VA HB1743 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1743ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1743ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial development authorities; size of board in certain towns; quorum. Reduces from seven to five the number of members that may be appointed to industrial development authority boards by the Towns of Kenbridge and Victoria and reduces the quorum requirement to three members.
Title
Industrial development authorities; size of board in certain towns, quorum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1743ER) |
2021-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100627D |