VA HB1740 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designation of special safety corridors for vehicles transporting explosives or inflammable gas or liquid. Allows the governing body of any county or city to designate any portion of the primary or secondary road system as a special safety corridor if the number of vehicles transporting explosives or inflammable gas or liquid averages more than 200 vehicles per day and the corridor is located near a school. Applicable fines for certain violations within the established special safety corridor shall be doubled.
Title
Special safety corridors; county or city to designate for vehicles transporting explosives, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100734D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1740 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1740+hil |