VA HB174 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; protocols for communication with individuals with autism spectrum disorders, intellectual disabilities, and developmental disabilities. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish protocols for communication by law-enforcement personnel with individuals diagnosed with autism spectrum disorders, intellectual disabilities, and developmental disabilities.
Title
Communication with individuals with certain disabilities; Dept. of CJS to establish protocol.
Sponsors
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Christopher Collins [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Sen. Emily Brewer [R] |
Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101919D |