VA HB1738 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retail sales and use tax; aviation parts, engines, and supplies. Creates an exemption from the retail sales and use tax for parts, engines, and supplies used for maintaining, repairing, or reconditioning aircraft, including unmanned aerial systems. The exemption does not apply to tools and other equipment not attached to or that does not become a part of the aircraft. The exemption is effective from July 1, 2018, to July 1, 2022.
Title
Retail sales and use tax; aviation parts, engines, and supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0714) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 714 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1738ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1738H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104745D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104745D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101016D |