VA HB1737 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Nurse practitioners; practice without a practice agreement. Reduces from five to two the number of years of full-time clinical experience a nurse practitioner must have to be eligible to practice without a written or electronic practice agreement. The provisions of the bill expire on July 1, 2022. Nurse practitioners; practice without a practice agreement. Reduces from five to two the number of years of full-time clinical experience a nurse practitioner must have to be eligible to practice without a written or electronic practice agreement. The provisions of the bill expire on July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse practitioners; practice without a practice agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (76-Y 22-N)
2021-01-28HousePrinted as engrossed 21100242D-E
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1737E
2021-01-28HouseAmendments by Delegate Adams, D.M. agreed to
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-10-27HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-10-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100242D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412957(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1737
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1737+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1737E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1737AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103966A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1737F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1737FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1202V0001+HB1737
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0070+HB1737
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1253+HB1737
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0088+HB1737

Bill Comments 750

feedback