VA HB1736 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1736
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (6-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (6-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
School nurses; nomenclature. Prohibits any individual who provides nursing services in a public elementary or secondary school as a school board employee or through a contract with the local health department from using the title of school nurse unless such individual is a registered nurse who possesses an active license to practice in the Commonwealth. School nurses; nomenclature. Prohibits any individual who provides nursing services in a public elementary or secondary school as a school board employee or through a contract with the local health department from using the title of school nurse unless such individual is a registered nurse who possesses an active license to practice in the Commonwealth.
Title
School nurses; nursing services in a public elementary or secondary school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (6-Y 8-N) (Y: 6 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (6-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1736H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21102518D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 21102518D-H1 |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-08-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100241D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1736 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 274 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 274.01:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |