VA HB1731 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1731
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health care provider panels; vertically integrated carriers; providers. Requires any vertically integrated carrier to offer participation in each provider panel or network established for each of the vertically integrated carrier's policies, products, and plans, including all policies, products, and plans offered to individuals, employers, and enrollees in state and federal government benefit programs, to every provider in the Commonwealth under the same terms and conditions that apply to providers under common control with the vertically integrated carrier. The measure requires that the offered participation (i) be without any adverse tiering or other financial incentives that may discourage enrollees from utilizing the services of the provider, (ii) include all sites and services offered by the provider, and (iii) take into account the different characteristics of different providers with regard to the range, nature, cost, and complexity of services offered. The measure prohibits an officer or director of a vertically integrated carrier from simultaneously serving as an officer or director of an entity that owns, operates, manages, or controls an acute care hospital located, in whole or in part, in the Commonwealth. The measure defines "vertically integrated carrier" as a health insurer or other carrier that owns an interest in, is owned by, or is under common ownership or control with an acute care hospital facility, excluding an entity that is under the ultimate control of or under common control with a public hospital.
Title
Health care provider panel; definition of "vertically-integrated carrier."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20106073D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1731 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1731 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1731+hil |