VA HB1731 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Natural Resources; report on certain environmental issues. Requires the Secretary of Natural Resources, in consultation with appropriate state and federal agencies, to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly on certain environmental issues, including energy, air pollution, and adaptation and resilience to extreme weather events and sea-level rise. The bill provides that the Secretary shall recommend necessary legislative action and may pursue available federal or private grants to assist the Secretary in providing the report.
Title
Natural Resources, Secretary of; required to report on certain environmental issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103170D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1731 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1731+hil |