VA HB1730 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; grounds for suspension or revocation of license; exception. Allows a licensee to employ a person who has been convicted of a felony or a crime involving moral turpitude if (i) except for violations involving the adulteration of food, drink, or other substances with the intent to kill or injure or the administering or attempting to administer poison in food, drink, or certain other substances with the intent to kill or injure, two years have elapsed following the conviction and the person has completed and been released from the term of any probation or parole, if applicable, or (ii) the licensee has obtained written approval for such employment from the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and, in instances in which the person has not completed or been released from the term of any probation or parole, the Authority has consulted with the person's probation and parole officer. Alcoholic beverage control; grounds for suspension or revocation of license; exception. Allows a licensee to employ a person who has been convicted of a felony or a crime involving moral turpitude if (i) except for violations involving the adulteration of food, drink, or other substances with the intent to kill or injure or the administering or attempting to administer poison in food, drink, or certain other substances with the intent to kill or injure, two years have elapsed following the conviction and the person has completed and been released from the term of any probation or parole, if applicable, or (ii) the licensee has obtained written approval for such employment from the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and, in instances in which the person has not completed or been released from the term of any probation or parole, the Authority has consulted with the person's probation and parole officer.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; grounds for suspension or revocation of license, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774) | |
2023-04-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 774 (effective 7/1/23) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1730ER2) |
2023-04-12 | House | Reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1730ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23107269D-S2 (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1730S2 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 23107269D-S2 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Rehabilitation and Social Services Committee substitute rejected 23107158D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 23107269D-S2 (Surovell) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23107158D-S1 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1730H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106020D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106020D-H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100223D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 509.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |