VA HB1729 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Background checks; providers licensed by DBHDS. Allows community services boards and providers licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to hire for compensation a person who has been convicted of not more than one offense of assault and battery of a law-enforcement officer under §18.2-57, or an equivalent offense in another if (i) the person has been granted a simple pardon if the offense was a felony committed in Virginia, or the equivalent if the offense was committed in another state; (ii) more than 10 years have elapsed since the conviction; and (iii) the hiring provider determines, based upon a screening assessment, that the criminal behavior was substantially related to the applicant's substance abuse and that the person has been successfully rehabilitated and is not a risk to consumers based on his criminal history background and his substance abuse history, notwithstanding the statutory prohibition on employment of a person otherwise convicted of assault and battery.
Title
Criminal background checks; DBHDS to use for employment of certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 15-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 15-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 657 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1729ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 15-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House (80-Y 15-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1729H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104396D-H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104396D-H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100805D |