VA HB1725 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public school building security enhancements; compliance with Uniform Statewide Building Code and Statewide Fire Prevention Code. Requires each school board, in consultation with the local building official and the state or local fire marshal, to develop a procurement plan to ensure that all security enhancements to public school buildings are in compliance with the Uniform Statewide Building Code and Statewide Fire Prevention Code.
Title
Public school building security enhancements; compliance with Uniform Statewide Building Code, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 121 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1725ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102593D-E |
2019-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1725E |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102593D |